This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 04:03:53 (UTC).

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. VS. ERIC SORSEN

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ERIC SORSEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendant

ERIC SORSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11906786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11731003.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11906786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11731003.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/25/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/25/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11911015 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11735

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11911015 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11735232.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/26/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/26/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 02/17/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 02/17/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/17/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/17/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11921119 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11745316.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11921119 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11745316.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/23/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/23/2016

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/23/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11921119 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11745316.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED ON 02/17/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 02/17/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/16/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2443913 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016 04:18:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/26/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11911015 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11735232.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/25/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4494702 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2016 05:00:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11906786 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11731003.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2436516 RECEIVED ON 01/15/2016 01:41:14 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant