This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:23 (UTC).

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. VS. DOBRIVOJE RISTIC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOBRIVOJE RISTIC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendants

SORAIA MARIN

JUAN MARIN

DOBRIVOJE RISTIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Other Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751306.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751306.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 03/16/16) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 03/16/16) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11937343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761537.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11937343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761537.

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/03/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/03/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/16/16) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/16/16) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 01/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11937343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761537.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 03/16/16) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/16/16) RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4517610 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016 12:34:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927081 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751306.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY AVALONBAY COMMUNITIES, INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385085 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:56:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less