This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 05:41:09 (UTC).

AUSTIN HOUSOS VS. BEST DEAL AUTO BROKERS

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 AUSTIN HOUSOS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEST DEAL AUTO BROKERS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Austin Housos

Defendants

American Safety Casualty Insurance Co.

Best Deal Auto Brokers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosner, Barry & Babbitt, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13050462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12878478.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13050462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12878478.

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (OF VENUE) FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (OF VENUE) FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN; ROSNER, BARRY & BABBITT, LLP ON 05/18/2022

CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN; ROSNER, BARRY & BABBITT, LLP ON 05/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 06/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 06/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 06/01/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 06/01/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 07/08/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 07/08/2022

 

Docket Entries

07/11/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31178533 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2022 01:33:06 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 07/08/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 06/02/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41341860 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2022 09:22:17 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 06/01/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1995265 RECEIVED ON 06/01/2022 12:19:25 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 05/18/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13050462 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12878478.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSTATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAFFIDAVIT - OTHER (OF VENUE) FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN; ROSNER, BARRY & BABBITT, LLP ON 05/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HOUSOS, AUSTIN ON 05/18/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31158071 RECEIVED ON 05/18/2022 07:19:07 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less