This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 20:01:28 (UTC).

AURA FINANCIAL LLC VS. BENJAMIN NAVA NAJERA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 AURA FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BENJAMIN NAVA NAJERA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AURA FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

BENJAMIN NAVA NAJERA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY AURA FINANCIAL LLC ON 01/13/2020; Filing Party: AURA FINANCIAL LLC ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 01/13/2020 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41042391 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2019 11:30:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY AURA FINANCIAL LLC ON 12/06/2019; Filing Party: AURA FINANCIAL LLC ON 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ABC LEGAL SERVICES, INC. FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12661359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12486040.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C62 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY AURA FINANCIAL LLC ON 11/18/2019; Filing Party: AURA FINANCIAL LLC ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.