This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/27/2018 04:36:50

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by Atlantic Credit Finance Special Finance Unit Llc against Kassandra Neumann in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 03/10/2017
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant Kassandra Neumann
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, Llc
  • Represented By
    • Law Office Of Rosen And Loeb

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ...

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE ...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILE...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILE...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1S...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1S...

Fees Apply
COMPLAINT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE...

COMPLAINT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE...

Fees Apply
CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SP...

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SP...

Fees Apply
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2017 AT 01:30...

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2017 AT 01:30...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
  • 07/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.
  • 07/20/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE UNIT, LLC ON 07/20/2017
  • 07/26/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3568506 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2017 11:49:02 AM.
  • 06/30/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/10/2017 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 03/13/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12121127 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11944926.
  • 03/10/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE UNIT, LLC ON 03/10/2017
  • 03/10/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE UNIT, LLC ON 03/10/2017
  • 03/10/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE UNIT, LLC ON 03/10/2017
  • 03/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4691431 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2017 07:53:09 PM.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.