This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 16:06:05 (UTC).

ARTHUR LOCKHART VS. PETSMART LLC

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 ARTHUR LOCKHART filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PETSMART LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARTHUR LOCKHART

Defendant

PETSMART LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: VCC5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 11/03/2021; Filing Party: LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 11/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 10/27/2021; Filing Party: LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 10/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LOCKHART, ARTHUR FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962140 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12790063.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 10/26/2021; Filing Party: LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/15/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 10/26/2021; Filing Party: LOCKHART, ARTHUR ON 10/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant