This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:30 (UTC).

ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. VS. AWI BUILDING, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ARROW CONCRETE CUTTING, CO , INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AWI BUILDING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC.

Defendants

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

CALIFORNIA FAIRS FINANCIAL AUTHORITY

AWI BUILDING, INC.

AWI BUILDERS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GREEN LAW GROUP, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

FELDMAN & ASSOCIATES, INC

ORBACH HUFF SUAREZ & HENDERSON LLP

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA FAIRS FINANCIAL AUTHORITY ON 04/29/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA FAIRS FINANCIAL AUTHORITY ON 04/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11986603 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11810688.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11986603 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11810688.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 05/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 05/19/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA FAIRS FINANCIAL AUTHORITY ON 06/17/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA FAIRS FINANCIAL AUTHORITY ON 06/17/2016

NOTICE - OTHER (OF PROCEEDINGS) FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

NOTICE - OTHER (OF PROCEEDINGS) FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 01/12/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 01/12/2017

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY; AWI BUILDERS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY; AWI BUILDERS, INC. ON 06/17/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 12/30/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 12/30/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 07/29/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 07/29/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4555107 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4555107 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AWI BUILDERS, INC. ON 06/28/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY AWI BUILDERS, INC. ON 06/28/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/18/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/26/2016.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 04/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 04/26/2016

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 01/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1363252 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2017 10:10:43 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 12/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3494651 RECEIVED ON 12/30/2016 10:58:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2481769 RECEIVED ON 07/29/2016 11:20:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/27/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • THE VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C22.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF PROCEEDINGS) FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 03/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3386666 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 09:47:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928130 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752355.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ARROW CONCRETE & CUTTING, CO., INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385306 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:23:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.