This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 09:23:31 (UTC).

ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY VS. CHANEL LAKIN

Case Summary

On 04/04/2016 ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHANEL LAKIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Defendant

CHANEL LAKIN

Assignee

JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12214292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12037992.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12214292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12037992.

WRIT (09/01/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 08/31/2017.

WRIT (09/01/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 08/31/2017.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 08/31/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 08/31/2017

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 08/31/2017

ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 08/31/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12004853 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11828936.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12004853 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11828936.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 07/26/2016) RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 07/26/2016) RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016.

JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 07/12/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 07/12/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/03/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 06/03/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 06/03/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 05/04/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 05/04/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953027 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777192.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953027 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777192.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 04/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 04/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12214292 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12037992.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (09/01/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 08/31/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 08/31/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY JUDGMENT RECOVERY ASSISTANCE, LLC ON 08/31/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3582758 RECEIVED ON 08/31/2017 11:40:05 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12004853 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11828936.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 07/26/2016) RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2480033 RECEIVED ON 07/22/2016 11:31:49 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 07/12/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 04/18/2016) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4534069 RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016 03:59:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11946331 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11770486.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY ON 04/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4527466 RECEIVED ON 04/04/2016 07:45:16 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARNEL MANAGEMENT COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Judgment Recovery Assistance, LLC is a litigant