This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/26/2020 at 03:34:15 (UTC).

ARASH MADDAH VS POUPAK MADDAH

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 ARASH MADDAH filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against POUPAK MADDAH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WATSON, WILLIAM and COOPER, SCOTT B.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1167

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judges

WATSON, WILLIAM

COOPER, SCOTT B.

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

MADDAH, POUPAK KATY

MADDAH, ARASH ASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

MADISON LAW, APC

LAW OFFICES OF ATHAR A. KHAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - REASSIGNMENT - RELATED CASE 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingDescription: APPOINTMENT - DVPSP INVESTIGATION; Department: FAMILY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE PREVENTION SERVICES PROJECT 07/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketAPPOINTMENT - DVPSP INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: MADDAH, POUPAK KATY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: MADDAH, ARASH ASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketORDER - ATTEND DV PREVENTION SERVICES PROJECT 07/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 07/02/2020; Filing Party: MADDAH, ARASH ASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: MADDAH, ARASH ASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: MADDAH, ARASH ASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketORDER - MEET WITH COURT INVESTIGATOR - REMOTE 07/02/2020 Poupak Maddah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketORDER - MEET WITH COURT INVESTIGATOR - REMOTE 07/02/2020 Arash Maddah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: MADDAH, ARASH ASH

    Read MoreRead Less