Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 08:13:04 (UTC).

ARACELY PEREZ VS CELEDONIO GUERRERO

Case Summary

On 05/09/2017 ARACELY PEREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CELEDONIO GUERRERO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3862

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

Respondent

GUERRERO, CELEDONIO PEREZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 07/12/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/05/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 07/05/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 07/05/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/05/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 07/05/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/05/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/12/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/09/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/09/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 05/09/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 05/09/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/09/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • SUMMONS 05/09/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 05/09/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 05/09/2017; Filing Party: PEREZ, ARACELY SANCHEZ

    Read MoreRead Less