This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:38 (UTC).

ARACELI AGUILA VS. M.A.S. FINANCIAL

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 ARACELI AGUILA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against M A S FINANCIAL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARACELI AGUILA

Defendant

M.A.S. FINANCIAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2013
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULL FILED BY AGUILA, ARACELI ON 10/25/2013; Filing Party: AGUILA, ARACELI ON 10/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/07/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY AGUILA, ARACELI ON 09/09/2013; Filing Party: AGUILA, ARACELI ON 09/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254063.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY AGUILA, ARACELI ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: AGUILA, ARACELI ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less