This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/06/2021 at 05:58:14 (UTC).

APRIL JOHNSON GLASPIE VS. AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 APRIL JOHNSON GLASPIE filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

April Johnson Glaspie

Defendant

American Career College, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kazerouni Law Group, APC

Defendant Attorney

Duane Morris LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1764991 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1764991 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER (DISMISSAL OF ACTION W/O PREJUDICE) FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 10/05/2020

ORDER - OTHER (DISMISSAL OF ACTION W/O PREJUDICE) FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 10/05/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/05/2020 09:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/05/2020 09:59:00 AM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF JASON A. IBEY) FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 09/28/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF JASON A. IBEY) FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 09/28/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED ON 09/28/2020.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED ON 09/28/2020.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/28/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/28/2020

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 09/24/2020

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 09/24/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 09/02/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 09/02/2020

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 09/02/2020

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 09/02/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/02/2020

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/02/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12774722 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12601377.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12774722 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12601377.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1764991 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1772012 RECEIVED ON 09/28/2020 09:29:03 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/05/2020 09:59:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (DISMISSAL OF ACTION W/O PREJUDICE) FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT (DECLARATION OF JASON A. IBEY) FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 09/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE, INC. ON 08/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SANDERS, GLENDA ON 08/06/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12763901 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12590340.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY JOHNSON GLASPIE, APRIL ON 08/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3926012 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2020 12:15:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CAREER COLLEGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant