This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 09:33:34 (UTC).

APRIL ARISIAN VS. DWELL LAGUNA LLC

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 APRIL ARISIAN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against DWELL LAGUNA LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

April Arisian

Brian Kodi

Defendants

Andrew Edwards McDonald

Ann Elizabeth Metzger

Compass California, Inc.

Dwell Laguna LLC

Evan Westcott

Henry Plascencia

Joshua Fletcher

Paul Gerard Selecky

R.E. Advisors Corp.

Real Estate of the Pacific, Inc.

Sotheby's International Realty, Inc.

UMRO Realty Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wolff Mascaro LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Intelink Law Group, PC

Zelms Erlich & Mack

Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

Grant, Genovese & Baratta, LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/13/2023 03:04:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/13/2023 03:04:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13160845 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12988942.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13160845 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12988942.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 01/04/2023

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COMPASS CALIFORNIA, INC.; PLASCENCIA, HENRY ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COMPASS CALIFORNIA, INC.; PLASCENCIA, HENRY ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FLETCHER, JOSHUA; WESTCOTT, EVAN; DWELL LAGUNA LLC ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FLETCHER, JOSHUA; WESTCOTT, EVAN; DWELL LAGUNA LLC ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY METZGER, ANN ELIZABETH; UMRO REALTY CORP. ON 01/04/2023

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY METZGER, ANN ELIZABETH; UMRO REALTY CORP. ON 01/04/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149621 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977718.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13149621 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12977718.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DWELL LAGUNA LLC; WESTCOTT, EVAN; FLETCHER, JOSHUA ON 12/02/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DWELL LAGUNA LLC; WESTCOTT, EVAN; FLETCHER, JOSHUA ON 12/02/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13146271 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12974368.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13146271 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12974368.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DWELL LAGUNA LLC; WESTCOTT, EVAN; FLETCHER, JOSHUA ON 12/02/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DWELL LAGUNA LLC; WESTCOTT, EVAN; FLETCHER, JOSHUA ON 12/02/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 930.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13144193 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12972287.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 930.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13144193 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12972287.

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT-ALL REFERENCES TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES) FILED BY COMPASS CALIFORNIA, INC.; PLASCENCIA, HENRY ON 11/17/2022

MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT-ALL REFERENCES TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES) FILED BY COMPASS CALIFORNIA, INC.; PLASCENCIA, HENRY ON 11/17/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY COMPASS CALIFORNIA, INC.; PLASCENCIA, HENRY ON 11/17/2022

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY COMPASS CALIFORNIA, INC.; PLASCENCIA, HENRY ON 11/17/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13134474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12962545.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13134474 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12962545.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/13/2023 03:04:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/28/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13160845 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12988942.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31252222 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2023 10:37:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - CERTIFIED MAIL - OUT OF STATE FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 09/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41388635 RECEIVED ON 09/22/2022 03:25:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21201555 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2022 05:34:16 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 08/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/19/2023 AT 02:00:00 PM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13096556 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12924558.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21199537 RECEIVED ON 08/22/2022 03:55:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 08/22/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 08/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ARISIAN, APRIL; KODI, BRIAN ON 08/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less