This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/20/2021 at 21:45:38 (UTC).

ANTONIO LOPEZ VS ENID RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 ANTONIO LOPEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ENID RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SYKES, DAPHNE G.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1290

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

SYKES, DAPHNE G.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOPEZ, ANTONIO

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ, ENID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF JAMES P CRONN

Respondent Attorneys

WERNO, DON

WERNO FAMILY LAW SOLUTIONS

Other Attorneys

LESPIER, MANFREDO E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION; Department: L64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketHEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: APPOINTMENT - MEDIATION; Department: FAMILY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketREPORT - CONFIDENTIAL - CHILD SAFETY - SOCIAL SERVICES AGENC 04/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSTATUS - MEDIATION 04/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketAPPOINTMENT - MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION; Department: L64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingDescription: APPOINTMENT - INVESTIGATOR TESTIMONY - EMERGENCY; Department: FAMILY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION & ORDER 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketORDER - ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION - REMOTE 03/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 03/10/2021; Filing Party: RODRIGUEZ, ENID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/10/2021; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 03/10/2021; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 03/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 03/10/2021; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/10/2021; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/10/2021; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS 03/10/2021; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - FAMILY LAW 03/10/2021 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: LOPEZ, ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LESPIER MANFREDO E