This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/10/2019 at 20:01:38 (UTC).

ANNE M. CHAMPION VS. 91 ENTERPRISE LLC

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 ANNE M CHAMPION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against 91 ENTERPRISE LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNE M. CHAMPION

Defendant

91 ENTERPRISE LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ERLICH, GILAD FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF .50, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12611685 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12436064.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 08/27/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CHAMPION, ANNE M. ON 08/20/2019; Filing Party: CHAMPION, ANNE M. ON 08/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CHAMPION, ANNE MARIE FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12579114 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12403113.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/27/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H09 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CHAMPION, ANNE M. ON 06/28/2019; Filing Party: CHAMPION, ANNE M. ON 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 91 ENTERPRISE LLC. DBA BRILLIANCE NEW YORK is a litigant