This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 19:07:05 (UTC).

ANNABEL PASTRANA VS. EDMOND ELDABE

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 ANNABEL PASTRANA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EDMOND ELDABE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Annabel Pastrana

Lianne Pastrana

Defendants

Edmond Eldabe

Jessica Castro

El Dabe Ritter Trial Lawyers

S Edmond ElDabe

S Edmond El Dabe

Guardian Ad Litem

LIANNE PASTANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Joseph C. Rosenblit

Defendant Attorney

Kjar, McKenna & Stockalper, LLP

Other Attorneys

ELDABE RITTER TRIAL LAWYERS

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032631 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032631 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378826 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378826 REJECTED.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL; PASTRANA, LIANNE ON 11/02/2022

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL; PASTRANA, LIANNE ON 11/02/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ELDABE, EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ELDABE, EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ELDABE, S EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ELDABE, S EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY EL DABE RITTER TRIAL LAWYERS ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY EL DABE RITTER TRIAL LAWYERS ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CASTRO, JESSICA ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CASTRO, JESSICA ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY EL DABE, S EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY EL DABE, S EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/24/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/24/2022 09:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/20/2022 09:25:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/20/2022 09:25:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2022 11:12:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2022 11:12:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPE IN THE AMOUNT OF

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPE IN THE AMOUNT OF 2,235.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13098874 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12926876.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ELDABE, EDMOND; EL DABE RITTER TRIAL LAWYERS; CASTRO, JESSICA; ELDABE, S EDMOND; EL DABE, S EDMOND ON 08/30/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ELDABE, EDMOND; EL DABE RITTER TRIAL LAWYERS; CASTRO, JESSICA; ELDABE, S EDMOND; EL DABE, S EDMOND ON 08/30/2022

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY ELDABE, EDMOND; EL DABE RITTER TRIAL LAWYERS; CASTRO, JESSICA; ELDABE, S EDMOND; EL DABE, S EDMOND ON 08/30/2022

MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY ELDABE, EDMOND; EL DABE RITTER TRIAL LAWYERS; CASTRO, JESSICA; ELDABE, S EDMOND; EL DABE, S EDMOND ON 08/30/2022

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 12/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 02/27/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11032631 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41378826 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL; PASTRANA, LIANNE ON 11/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41405981 RECEIVED ON 11/02/2022 12:10:05 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31226007 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2022 03:10:06 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ELDABE, EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ELDABE, S EDMOND ON 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED ON 05/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL ON 05/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL ON 05/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/19/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C31 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 04/19/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12864364.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL; PASTRANA, LIANNE ON 04/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL; PASTRANA, LIANNE ON 04/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PASTRANA, ANNABEL; PASTRANA, LIANNE ON 04/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41323831 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2022 07:59:14 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less