This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 20:02:24 (UTC).

ANNA ZALVOVSKAIA VS. HOUSE OF IMPORTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 ANNA ZALVOVSKAIA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOUSE OF IMPORTS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNA ZALVOVSKAIA

Defendant

HOUSE OF IMPORTS, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/28/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41408711 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2022 08:03:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY ZALVOVSKAIA, ANNA ON 11/08/2022; Filing Party: ZALVOVSKAIA, ANNA ON 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/28/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13129652 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12957717.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41404549 RECEIVED ON 10/29/2022 07:33:19 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ZALVOVSKAIA, ANNA ON 10/31/2022; Filing Party: ZALVOVSKAIA, ANNA ON 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less