This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/26/2020 at 03:34:46 (UTC).

ANNA WORONOWICZ VS DANIEL CLARK

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 ANNA WORONOWICZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DANIEL CLARK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HENSON, CAROL L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1168

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

WORONOWICZ, ANNA

CLARK, DANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingDescription: APPOINTMENT - DVPSP INVESTIGATION; Department: FAMILY COURT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketAPPOINTMENT - DVPSP INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketORDER - ATTEND DV PREVENTION SERVICES PROJECT 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketORDER - ATTEND DV PREVENTION SERVICES PROJECT 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WORONOWICZ, ANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketREFERRAL - FAMILY COURT SERVICES 07/02/2020 DVPSP ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WORONOWICZ, ANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WORONOWICZ, ANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WORONOWICZ, ANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/02/2020; Filing Party: WORONOWICZ, ANNA

    Read MoreRead Less