This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 20:02:46 (UTC).

ANNA WEDEL VS. GUADALUPE MEDINA

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 ANNA WEDEL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GUADALUPE MEDINA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANNA WEDEL

Defendant

GUADALUPE MEDINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketTHE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/23/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST - OTHER FILED BY MEDINA, GUADALUPE ON 12/18/2019; Filing Party: MEDINA, GUADALUPE ON 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE SUBMITTED BY WEDEL, ANNA REJECTED ON 12/16/2019.; Filing Party: DENCE SUBMITTED BY WEDEL, ANNA REJECTED ON 12/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketREQUEST - OTHER SUBMITTED BY MEDINA, GUADALUPE REJECTED ON 12/11/2019.; Filing Party: OTHER SUBMITTED BY MEDINA, GUADALUPE REJECTED ON 12/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/25/2019; Filing Party: WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketWEDEL, ANNA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 11/18/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/18/2019; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/18/2019; Filing Party: WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/23/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/18/2019; Filing Party: WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST - OTHER (FOR INTERPRETER) FILED BY WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/18/2019; Filing Party: WEDEL, ANNA ON 11/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.