This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 10:47:31 (UTC).

ANIE AKMAKJIAN VS. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 ANIE AKMAKJIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anie Akmakjian

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hamassian Law, APC

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew A. Chipman

Nicholas J. Boos

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21252379 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21252379 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41427707 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41427707 REJECTED.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/13/2022 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/13/2022 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/06/2022

NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/06/2022

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/06/2022

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/06/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 09/30/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 09/30/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 09/30/2022

OPPOSITION FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 09/30/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/06/2022 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/06/2022 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 08/22/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 08/22/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/22/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 08/22/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 08/05/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 08/05/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13077688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12905690.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13077688 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12905690.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/06/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 07/06/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/01/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/01/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/20/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/20/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/20/2022

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/20/2022

MOTION TO COMPEL (INSURANCE APPRAISAL; STAYED UNTIL APPRAISAL IS COMPLETE) FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/20/2022

MOTION TO COMPEL (INSURANCE APPRAISAL; STAYED UNTIL APPRAISAL IS COMPLETE) FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 05/20/2022

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: REVIEW HEARING; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21252379 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41427707 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41398088 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2022 02:57:17 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/13/2022 10:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketTHE REVIEW HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C33.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11048385 RECEIVED ON 10/06/2022 05:35:49 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY - OTHER FILED BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1977366 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2022 03:22:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41318218 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2022 09:24:09 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 04/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21141194 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 03/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13028337 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12856318.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 03/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AKMAKJIAN, ANIE ON 03/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31138535 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2022 05:15:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less