This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:47 (UTC).

ANGELO AGUILA VS JILLIAN AGUILA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ANGELO AGUILA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JILLIAN AGUILA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1669

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

Respondent

AGUILA, JILLIAN MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 09/20/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/20/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/20/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 09/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT & JUDGMENT 08/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 08/15/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • NOTICE - CASE REVIEW 08/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/11/2016 Amended; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • SUMMONS 06/14/2016 2nd Summons Issued; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/11/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/11/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: AGUILA, ANGELO LUIGI

    Read MoreRead Less