This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 15:14:27 (UTC).

ANGELA TORRES VS. ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 ANGELA TORRES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ALLIANTGROUP, L P. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELA TORRES

Defendants

ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.

DHAVAL JADAV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENNING RUIZ, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 01/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 01/05/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257981 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081701.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257981 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081701.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/22/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/13/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 11/13/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/28/2017 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/28/2017 02:00:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 08/25/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 08/25/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 08/23/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 08/23/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/28/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/28/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12158409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11982129.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12158409 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11982129.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P. ON 05/18/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P. ON 05/18/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P. ON 05/18/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P. ON 05/18/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 04/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 04/24/2017

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 04/18/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 04/18/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12141128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11964911.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12141128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11964911.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 04/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1443509 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2017 01:25:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3623176 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2018 03:03:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALLIANTGROUP, L.P.; JADAV, DHAVAL ON 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SCHEDULED FOR 03/12/2018 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257981 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081701.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1443510 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2017 01:26:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3537766 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2017 10:15:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 04/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4713450 RECEIVED ON 04/24/2017 12:03:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 04/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12141128 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11964911.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TORRES, ANGELA ON 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4710473 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2017 10:37:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less