This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:26:02 (UTC).

ANGELA BURCHFIELD VS. P.F. CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ANGELA BURCHFIELD filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against P F CHANG'S CHINA BISTRO, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGELA BURCHFIELD

Defendants

P.F. CHANG'S A CHINA BRISTO, INC

ELIZABETH GARRIOTT

P.F. CHANG'S BISTRO, INC.

SONIA AGUILLON

SONIA AGUILLON URRUTIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TINA LOCKLEAR

Defendant Attorney

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART P C

Other Attorneys

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILLON, SONIA ON 02/26/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILLON, SONIA ON 02/26/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 04/20/2018 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION 04/20/2018 10:00:00 AM.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/10/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S BISTRO, INC.; AGUILLON URRUTIA, SONIA ON 04/13/2018

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S BISTRO, INC.; AGUILLON URRUTIA, SONIA ON 04/13/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/16/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/16/2018

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S BISTRO, INC. ON 06/01/2018

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S BISTRO, INC. ON 06/01/2018

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 12/27/2017

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 12/27/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 02/15/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 02/15/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12317581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12141351.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12317581 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12141351.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 02/06/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 02/06/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S BISTRO, INC.; AGUILLON URRUTIA, SONIA ON 03/20/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S BISTRO, INC.; AGUILLON URRUTIA, SONIA ON 03/20/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12439866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12263545.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12439866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12263545.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4894358 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4894358 REJECTED.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 04/16/2019

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 04/16/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12306021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12129761.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12306021 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12129761.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/02/2018 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/02/2018 09:30:00 AM.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S A CHINA BRISTO, INC ON 11/22/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY P.F. CHANG'S A CHINA BRISTO, INC ON 11/22/2017

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1650241 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/24/2019 01:57:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • REVIEW HEARING CONTINUED TO 03/19/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX105 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 04/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4959281 RECEIVED ON 04/16/2019 11:47:47 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12439866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12263545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR CONTINUANCE OF REVIEW HEARING) FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2723046 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2018 12:59:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4788653 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2017 10:55:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1433210 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2017 10:19:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER COLAW, THIERRY ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12235695 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12059375.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BURCHFIELD, ANGELA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775566 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 09:57:49 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.