This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:45:30 (UTC).

ANGEL L. RIVERA VS. PENEGON MISSION VIEJO, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ANGEL L RIVERA filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PENEGON MISSION VIEJO, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANGEL L. RIVERA JR

Defendant

PENEGON MISSION VIEJO, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSNER, BARRY & BABBITT, LLP

 

Court Documents

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 03/28/2016

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 03/28/2016

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928365 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752583.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928365 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752583.

COMPLAINT FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 03/30/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 03/30/2016

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 05/20/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 05/20/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 05/20/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4551013 RECEIVED ON 05/20/2016 06:18:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 03/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1313601 RECEIVED ON 03/30/2016 09:44:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 03/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4524434 RECEIVED ON 03/28/2016 04:09:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/23/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928365 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752583.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY RIVERA, ANGEL L. JR ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446804 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:46:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.