This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:27:11 (UTC).

ANDREW VONGREMP VS. DUSTIN LABONTE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ANDREW VONGREMP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DUSTIN LABONTE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW VONGREMP

Defendants

MARY GRZEGORCZYK

DUSTIN LABONTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SUSAN M. THOM

 

Court Documents

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUBMITTED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW REJECTED ON 10/26/2017.

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUBMITTED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW REJECTED ON 10/26/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 11/17/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 11/17/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/31/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/31/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070438.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070438.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/20/2017

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/20/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/19/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/19/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234271 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057950.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234271 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057950.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240139 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063819.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240139 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063819.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/25/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/10/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246697 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070438.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/02/17) RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4783014 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017 02:14:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SUBMITTED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW REJECTED ON 10/26/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240139 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063819.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2604321 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2017 02:13:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234271 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057950.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY VONGREMP, ANDREW ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4776233 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:50:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.