This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:58 (UTC).

ANDREW TAM VO VS. ADRIANA ACOSTA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ANDREW TAM VO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ADRIANA ACOSTA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW TAM VO

Defendants

ADRIANA ACOSTA

MOISES RIVER

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 04/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 04/15/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/20/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/20/2016 08:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY VO, ANDREW TAM REJECTED ON 06/13/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY VO, ANDREW TAM REJECTED ON 06/13/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 07/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 07/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 06/28/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 06/28/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY VO, TAM FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927373 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751598.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY VO, TAM FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927373 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751598.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 07/08/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 06/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT SUBMITTED BY VO, ANDREW TAM REJECTED ON 06/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 05/20/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 07/08/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/20/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 04/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY VO, TAM FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927373 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751598.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY VO, ANDREW TAM ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.