This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 08:27:48 (UTC).

ANASTASIYA TROTSKO VS. BRIAN VOYTEK

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 ANASTASIYA TROTSKO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRIAN VOYTEK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANASTASIYA TROTSKO

Defendant

BRIAN VOYTEK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12116639 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11940460.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12116639 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11940460.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/10/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/10/2017.

COMPLAINT FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12134411 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11958214.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12134411 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11958214.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12120927 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11944738.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12120927 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11944738.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 05/25/2018

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 05/25/2018

APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER TO POST - GRANTED) FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/13/2017

APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER TO POST - GRANTED) FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/13/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12134411 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11958214.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 04/05/17) RECEIVED ON 04/04/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT - OTHER (CCP 1169) FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 04/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION - OTHER (ORDER TO POST - GRANTED) FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12120927 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11944738.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 03/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1372774 RECEIVED ON 03/10/2017 12:19:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12116639 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11940460.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TROTSKO, ANASTASIYA ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2535498 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2017 12:43:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less