Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 02:41:26 (UTC).

ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC VS. NATIONAL MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONAL MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC

ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendant

NATIONAL MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEROME M. JACKSON

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH SARNOWSKI

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/11/2019 10:11:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/11/2019 10:11:00 AM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 07/10/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 07/10/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/24/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/24/2019 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12484994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12308693.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12484994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12308693.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 01/14/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 01/14/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 01/14/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 01/14/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/13/2018 11:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/13/2018 11:59:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12449245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12272941.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12449245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12272941.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION ON 11/06/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY NATIONAL MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION ON 11/06/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4904219 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4904219 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 10/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 10/15/2018

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 09/14/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 09/14/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12419342 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12243042.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12419342 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12243042.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/11/2019 10:11:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/18/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 12/18/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1642557 RECEIVED ON 07/10/2019 01:44:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/24/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • THE COURT TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 07/15/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NATIONAL MERCHANTS ASSOCIATION ON 01/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 10/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1550765 RECEIVED ON 10/15/2018 10:22:10 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/10/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 09/14/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12419342 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12243042.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB, LLC; ANAHEIM ARENA MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 09/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1540663 RECEIVED ON 09/14/2018 11:11:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANAHEIM DUCKS HOCKEY CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where National Merchants Association, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Anaheim Arena Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Sarnowski