This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:14 (UTC).

ANA AGUILAR VS FERNANDO MORALES

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by ANA AGUILAR against FERNANDO MORALES in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2494

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Others

MORALES, FERNANDO

AGUILAR, ANA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • REPORT - CONFIDENTIAL 10/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DECLARATION 10/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • REPORT - CONFIDENTIAL 04/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - AMENDED 04/23/2018 3rd Amended; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • REPORT - CONFIDENTIAL 01/16/2018 Letter-progress report

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • FINANCIAL STATEMENT - SIMPLIFIED 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - MEET WITH COURT INVESTIGATOR 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - MEET WITH COURT INVESTIGATOR 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - ATTEND DV PREVENTION SERVICES PROJECT 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: AGUILAR, ANA L

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.