This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 06:51:35 (UTC).

AMY JU WONG VS. ELIZABETH E. WONG

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 AMY JU WONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELIZABETH E WONG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003

AMY JU WONG

AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989

BRADLY WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L.T. WONG BOYS 2002 ALASKA TRUST, DATED OCTOBER 3, 2002

BRADLEY WONG

STEPHEN G. HOLMES

GLOBAL CAPITAL MARKETS INC

KATHRYN WONG

BAYSIDE REAL ESTATE II, LLC

BRADLEY WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE WONG CHILDREN'S REVOCABLE FAMILY TRUSTE, DATED FEBURARY 22, 2002

Defendants and Others

PATRICK M. SCHMIDT

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON CORPORATION

ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996

PREMIER SUPPLY CHAIN IMPROVEMENT, INC.

PATRICK M. SCHMIDT, TRUSTEE OF THE SCHMIDT FAMILY TRUST, DATED MARCH 11, 1992

ELIZABETH E. WONG

FFF ENTERPRISES, INC.

EDWARD S. INOUYE

ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

OUTWATER & PINCKES, LLP

STUART KANE LLP

MILLER BARONDESS, LLP

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

Blanchard, Krasner & French, APC

Sitzer Law Group

STUART KANELLP

BLANCHARD, KRASNER & FRENCH

Law Offices of Michael Leight

BRUCE G. SCHWEITZER

GARRETT CARCHIDI, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF M. CANDICE BRYNER

Defendant and Other Attorneys

MILLER BARONDESS, LLP

SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

Sitzer Law Group

BLANCHARD, KRASNER & FRENCH

Law Offices of Michael Leight

Other Attorneys

STEPHENS FRIEDLAND LLP

LAW OFFICE OF SHANDA BEACH

LAW OFFICES OF SEAN T. MCGEE

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF MATTHEW G. ARDOIN IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF THE 30 DAYS OF DEADLINE TO FILE DEMURRER) FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996 ON 02/22/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER (OF MATTHEW G. ARDOIN IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION OF THE 30 DAYS OF DEADLINE TO FILE DEMURRER) FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996 ON 02/22/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 01/23/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 01/23/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4794264 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4794264 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12255967 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12079699.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12255967 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12079699.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244720 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068461.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244720 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068461.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR FURTHER MUTUAL EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT & CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 10/26/2017

STIPULATION AND ORDER (FOR FURTHER MUTUAL EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT & CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 10/26/2017

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY WONG, AMY JU ON 09/19/2017

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY WONG, AMY JU ON 09/19/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765744 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4765744 REJECTED.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/08/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/08/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TONOKABONI, ANTHONY; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E. ON 09/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TONOKABONI, ANTHONY; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E. ON 09/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TONOKABONI, ANTHONY; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E. ON 09/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TONOKABONI, ANTHONY; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E. ON 09/07/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 08/29/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 08/29/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 08/21/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 08/21/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E.; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; TONOKABONI, ANTHONY ON 08/16/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E.; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; TONOKABONI, ANTHONY ON 08/16/2017

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E.; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; TONOKABONI, ANTHONY ON 08/16/2017

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E.; ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE ISABELLA WONG TRUST, DATED AUGUST 31, 2010; TONOKABONI, ANTHONY ON 08/16/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E. ON 08/16/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ELIZABETH E. WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG SEPARATE PROPERTY REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED NOVEMBER 25, 1996; WONG, ELIZABETH E. ON 08/16/2017

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 08/14/2017

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 08/14/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

252 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WONG, ELIZABETH E. ON 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2824799 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2019 02:55:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/07/2019 02:32:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 11/05/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/05/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 08/05/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3820020 RECEIVED ON 08/05/2019 11:22:44 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; WONG, AMY JU ON 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2822771 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2019 12:55:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
398 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE KIM G. DUNNING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 07/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. KIM G. DUNNING) FILED BY WONG, AMY JU ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2569235 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2017 11:26:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 06/28/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12179995 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12003705.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY WONG, AMY JU; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003 ON 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY WONG, AMY JU; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003 ON 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY WONG, AMY JU; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE WALLACE L. T. WONG AND AMY J. WONG FAMILY LIVING TRUST, DATED AUGUST 29, 1989; AMY JU WONG, TRUSTEE OF THE AMY J. WONG REVOCABLE TRUST, DATED FEBRUARY 27, 2003 ON 06/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1395946 RECEIVED ON 06/28/2017 04:22:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.