This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/20/2019 at 11:30:59 (UTC).

AMEZQUITA V AMEZQUITA

Case Summary

On 03/12/2012 AMEZQUITA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AMEZQUITA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HURWITZ, LON F.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2382

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

HURWITZ, LON F.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

Respondent

AMEZQUITA, SUSAN LYNN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2012
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/10/2012 09:55:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/10/2012 09:55:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, SUSAN LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/10/2012 09:55:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 10/10/2012 09:54:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • JUDGMENT 10/10/2012 09:54:00 # Pages:9; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 10/10/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2012
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 10/03/2012 17:01:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 07/10/2012 08:54:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/09/2012 11:16:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/09/2012 11:15:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • SUMMONS 03/12/2012 09:17:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/12/2012 09:17:00 # Pages:6; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/12/2012 09:16:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/12/2012 09:14:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: AMEZQUITA, MICHAEL RENE

    Read MoreRead Less