This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/01/2022 at 05:28:40 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS. CHAD LATHAM

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHAD LATHAM. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

Defendant

Chad Latham

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

JOSEPH A WEBER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12633911 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12458410.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12633911 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12458410.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 10/04/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 10/04/2019.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 11/08/2019

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 11/08/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LATHAM, CHAD ON 12/12/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LATHAM, CHAD ON 12/12/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12675310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12500066.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12675310 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12500066.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 02/18/2020

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 02/18/2020

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/02/2020 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/02/2020 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 05/26/2020

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 05/26/2020

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2906777 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2906777 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1733780 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1733780 REJECTED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1733780 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2906777 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2906306 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2020 12:03:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 05/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/03/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/26/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2869942 RECEIVED ON 12/12/2019 03:22:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2020 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 11/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1686098 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2019 08:49:55 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12633911 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12458410.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2845202 RECEIVED ON 10/04/2019 01:10:54 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 10/04/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK ON 10/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant