This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:18:52 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS. LESLIE POOL

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LESLIE POOL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

LESLIE POOL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE MOORE LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONAL CO

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

 

Court Documents

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 10/21/13) RECEIVED ON 10/21/2013.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 10/21/13) RECEIVED ON 10/21/2013.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3188973 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3188973 REJECTED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2013

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 10/18/13) RECEIVED ON 10/16/2013.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 10/18/13) RECEIVED ON 10/16/2013.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/21/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/21/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/21/2013

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/21/2013

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 11/17/2014

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 11/17/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11482641 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11306553.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11482641 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11306553.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 11/25/2013

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 11/25/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4165387 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4165387 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/01/2014) RECEIVED ON 04/01/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/01/2014) RECEIVED ON 04/01/2014.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 09/24/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 09/24/2013

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 11/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3216443 RECEIVED ON 11/17/2014 03:05:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3188973 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11569168 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11393053.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/01/2014) RECEIVED ON 04/01/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4167295 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2014 07:47:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4165387 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 11/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2294315 RECEIVED ON 11/25/2013 09:41:07 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 492364 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2013 09:43:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 09/24/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1114004 RECEIVED ON 09/24/2013 12:41:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462174 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 07:57:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less