This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:13:48 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK VS. CHRISTY JONES CLAREY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTY JONES CLAREY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

CHRISTY JONES CLAREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES, PC

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/16/2013 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/16/2013 08:30:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MILLER, FRANZ ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MILLER, FRANZ ON 08/12/2013.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 02/11/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 02/11/2014

CASE REASSIGNED TO SHEILA FELL EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

CASE REASSIGNED TO SHEILA FELL EFFECTIVE 01/06/2014.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 12/05/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 12/05/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 04/10/2014 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 04/10/2014 08:45:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 02/11/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 02/11/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/22/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/22/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/18/2014 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/18/2014 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 02/11/2014

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 02/11/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 04/04/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 04/04/2014

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254535.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254535.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 10/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4263550 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2014 01:45:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 04/10/2014 08:45:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2014 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C.22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/29/2014 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 04/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2323569 RECEIVED ON 04/04/2014 11:36:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/18/2014 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1130409 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2013 03:29:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/22/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 352254 RECEIVED ON 08/22/2013 02:12:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MILLER, FRANZ ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430663 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254535.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348053 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 08:13:32 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less