This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:45:57 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. MOHSEN MERTASH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOHSEN MERTASH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

MOHSEN MERTASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF SARA J. HAMILTON

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927444 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751669.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927444 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751669.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/14/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/14/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2450685 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016 11:28:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4519370 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2016 10:31:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927444 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751669.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1306891 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.