This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:49:49 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. MATTHEW JAMES PETERSON

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATTHEW JAMES PETERSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

MATTHEW JAMES PETERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICE OF SARA J. HAMILTON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/20/16) RECEIVED ON 06/16/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/20/16) RECEIVED ON 06/16/2016.

DECLARATION OF MAILING OR OF INABILITY TO ASCERTAIN ADDRESS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

DECLARATION OF MAILING OR OF INABILITY TO ASCERTAIN ADDRESS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/13/2016

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/13/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11986026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11810111.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11986026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11810111.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927396 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751621.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927396 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751621.

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 05/25/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 05/25/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 05/25/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 05/25/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 05/26/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 05/26/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016.

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 05/25/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 05/25/2016

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2501409 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2016 04:27:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11986026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11810111.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 6/20/16) RECEIVED ON 06/16/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2471109 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2016 01:10:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST PETERSON, MATTHEW JAMES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 05/26/2016) RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 05/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4552779 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016 01:28:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING OR OF INABILITY TO ASCERTAIN ADDRESS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3392692 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2016 10:40:36 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927396 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751621.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446544 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 08:55:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.