This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:13:51 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. MARIA GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

MARIA GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C

LAW OFFICES OF PATENAUDE & FELIX A.P.C.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/10/2013

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/10/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/14/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/14/2014

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 4/28/14) RECEIVED ON 04/25/2014.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 4/28/14) RECEIVED ON 04/25/2014.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/24/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/24/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/10/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/10/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/14/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/14/2014

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2014
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2014
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB IN THE AMOUNT OF 0.00 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST GOMEZ, MARIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 4/28/14) RECEIVED ON 04/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4174484 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2014 02:45:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/29/2014 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/10/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 369949 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2013 05:30:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462102 RECEIVED ON 08/10/2013 01:32:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less