This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:18 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS. BARBARA J JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARBARA J JOHNSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

BARBARA J JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICE OF SARA J. HAMILTON

BLEIER & COX APC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/20/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/20/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 11/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 11/28/2016.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 11/28/2016) RECEIVED ON 11/28/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/13/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/20/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/20/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12067895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11891840.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12067895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11891840.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/15/2017) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/15/2017) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 07/13/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/14/2017) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/14/2017) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 06/27/2016

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 06/27/2016

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/14/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/14/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12123297 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11947100.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12123297 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11947100.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12203235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026960.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12203235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026960.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927454 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751679.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927454 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751679.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/02/2017

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/02/2017

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/08/2016) RECEIVED ON 10/20/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/08/2016) RECEIVED ON 10/20/2016.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKET) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/20/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT PACKET) FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 10/20/2016

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12203235 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026960.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 08/14/2017) RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1406926 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2017 11:02:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12123297 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11947100.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/15/2017) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4692477 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2017 11:07:22 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12067895 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11891840.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4567171 RECEIVED ON 06/25/2016 10:03:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1318428 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2016 02:22:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 04/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1315432 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2016 09:28:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927454 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751679.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509441 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:54:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.