This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:18 (UTC).

AMELIA CICHOWSKI VS. ANGUS KEVIN MCKAY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 AMELIA CICHOWSKI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGUS KEVIN MCKAY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMELIA CICHOWSKI

Defendant

ANGUS KEVIN MCKAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2014
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 01/27/2014 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: OJD HEARING OF 1/27/14) FILED BY CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 01/24/2014; Filing Party: CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 01/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11510159 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11333960.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2014 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO PRODUCE STATEMENT OF ASSETS AND TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION FILED BY CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 12/11/2013; Filing Party: CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 12/11/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/08/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/08/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH ON 10/08/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 09/03/2013; Filing Party: CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 09/03/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430306 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254178.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/08/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: CICHOWSKI, AMELIA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less