Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 06:46:06 (UTC).

AMAL AL REFAIE VS. VILLA SIENA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 AMAL AL REFAIE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VILLA SIENA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amal Al Refaie

Defendants

Villa Siena

Irvine Apartment Communities, L.P.

Cuesta Properties, Inc.

Alta Services Inc.

The Irvine Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID MAMANN

Defendant Attorney

Robert W. Huston

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12889050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12716829.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12889050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12716829.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; VILLA SIENA ON 04/28/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; VILLA SIENA ON 04/28/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; VILLA SIENA ON 04/30/2021

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; VILLA SIENA ON 04/30/2021

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/18/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/18/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/22/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/22/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12860259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12687986.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12860259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12687986.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/17/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: COURT TRIAL; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12889050 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12716829.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41187059 RECEIVED ON 04/28/2021 10:33:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; VILLA SIENA ON 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1842136 RECEIVED ON 04/30/2021 03:45:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC; VILLA SIENA ON 04/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/18/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1825496 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2021 11:36:09 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12860259 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12687986.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41170058 RECEIVED ON 03/17/2021 01:53:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 03/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY REFAIE, AMAL AL ON 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ALTA SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where THE IRVINE COMPANY APARTMENT COMMUNITIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant