This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 12:55:24 (UTC).

ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS WAGE AND HOUR CASES

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS WAGE AND HOUR CASES was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5181

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maikel Gonzalez

Petitioners

John Maldonado Jr

JOHN MALDONADO

Defendant

Aluminum Precision Products, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moon & Yang, APC

Petitioner Attorney

Law Offices of Sima Farde, APC

Defendant Attorney

Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/02/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/02/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 09/08/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 09/08/2021

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR COORDINATION

ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR COORDINATION

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR COORDINATION 08/12/2021 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR COORDINATION 08/12/2021 02:00:00 PM.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE LATE FILING) FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE LATE FILING) FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE LATE FILING OF PETITIONER JOHN MALDONADO, JR.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE) FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE LATE FILING OF PETITIONER JOHN MALDONADO, JR.'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE) FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GONZALEZ, MAIKEL ON 08/10/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GONZALEZ, MAIKEL ON 08/10/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY GONZALEZ, MAIKEL ON 08/10/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY GONZALEZ, MAIKEL ON 08/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/02/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/02/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/02/2021

OPPOSITION FILED BY ALUMINUM PRECISION PRODUCTS, INC. ON 08/02/2021

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION

ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (CJC)

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (CJC)

ORDER - OTHER (ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE (CJC)) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/22/2021

ORDER - OTHER (ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE (CJC)) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/22/2021

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 09/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21062285 RECEIVED ON 09/08/2021 10:14:19 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION - OTHER HAS BEEN DENIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING PETITION FOR COORDINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR COORDINATION 08/12/2021 02:00:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31049329 RECEIVED ON 08/11/2021 10:16:32 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41227330 RECEIVED ON 08/11/2021 09:44:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1880978 RECEIVED ON 08/11/2021 09:47:12 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 08/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR COORDINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR COORDINATION SCHEDULED FOR 08/12/2021 AT 02:00:00 PM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 07/22/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (CJC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE (CJC)) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE (AOC)) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - OTHER (PETITION FOR COORDINATION AND STAY ORDER) FILED BY MALDONADO, JOHN JR ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less