This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 03:42:48 (UTC).

ALLY BANK VS. FREDDIE L. MANNING

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 ALLY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FREDDIE L MANNING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendant

Freddie L. Manning

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vanlochem & Associates

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13160986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12989083.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13160986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12989083.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/24/2023

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/24/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/31/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/31/2023

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21262907 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21262907 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCONVILLE; Department: C28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/10/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21262907 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21266089 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2023 11:07:51 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31260104 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2023 09:52:09 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/26/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13160986 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12989083.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31252065 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2023 03:57:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCONVILLE, THOMAS ON 01/04/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALLY BANK ON 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less