This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:45 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION VS. EDUARDO PEREZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDUARDO PEREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION

Defendant

EDUARDO PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TODD F. HAINES

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

DL-30 (CERTIFICATE OF FACTS) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

DL-30 (CERTIFICATE OF FACTS) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 94 - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS REGARDING UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT (DL 30), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 41.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12238166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12061846.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 94 - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS REGARDING UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT (DL 30), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 41.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12238166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12061846.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 11/16/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 11/16/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/07/17) RECEIVED ON 02/06/2017.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/07/17) RECEIVED ON 02/06/2017.

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2016

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 10/03/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12010340 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11834426.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12010340 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11834426.

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 01/12/2017

JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 01/12/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927674 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751899.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927674 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751899.

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS) FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 08/10/2016

APPLICATION - OTHER (AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS) FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 08/10/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 12/16/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS OR CITATION RECEIVED ON 07/28/2016.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS OR CITATION RECEIVED ON 07/28/2016.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 94 - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS REGARDING UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT (DL 30), 141- CERTIFYING A COPY, 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 41.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12238166 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12061846.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DL-30 (CERTIFICATE OF FACTS) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3596001 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:58:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3573791 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12104019 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11927940.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 02/07/17) RECEIVED ON 02/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2528486 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2017 10:55:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12010340 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11834426.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF TODD F. HAINES) FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 07/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS OR CITATION RECEIVED ON 07/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2481425 RECEIVED ON 07/28/2016 10:55:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927674 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751899.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385250 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 01:00:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.