This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/01/2022 at 10:17:06 (UTC).

ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. VS. CHUCK DORFMAN

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHUCK DORFMAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alliance Portfolio Private Equity Finance, Inc.

Defendant

Chuck Dorfman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nassie Law, A Professional Corporation

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021.

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/13/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/13/2021 09:00:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 09/10/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 08/30/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 08/30/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/28/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/28/2021 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 06/30/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 06/30/2021

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 06/22/2021

ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 06/22/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 06/14/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 06/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12882748 AND RECEIPT N

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12882748 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12710487.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 05/07/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 05/07/2021

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING; Judge: GOODING; Department: C31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31084477 RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021 02:28:06 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/13/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketTHE DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/10/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41033569 RECEIVED ON 11/12/2019 01:51:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 10/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2845251 RECEIVED ON 10/04/2019 02:02:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12632684 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12457203.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3841123 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2019 04:10:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 10/02/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE, INC. ON 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE PORTFOLIO PRIVATE EQUITY FINANCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant