This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:37 (UTC).

ALLEN MILIEFSKY VS. JORGE R. GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ALLEN MILIEFSKY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORGE R GOMEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN MILIEFSKY

Defendant

JORGE R. GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF COLYN B. DESATNIK

Defendant Attorney

GOMES, HIRSHIK & HUMMEL

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 08/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 08/10/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, JORGE R. ON 08/05/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOMEZ, JORGE R. ON 08/05/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/28/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/28/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/26/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2447238 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2447238 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/28/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12010505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11834602.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12010505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11834602.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 02/26/2016.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3387485 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3387485 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 07/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 07/22/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 2016-07-27 08:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 2016-07-27 08:30:00.0.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GOMEZ, JORGE R. ON 08/05/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GOMEZ, JORGE R. ON 08/05/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ, JORGE R. ON 08/05/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOMEZ, JORGE R. ON 08/05/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 07/13/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 07/13/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 2016-08-24 08:30:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 2016-08-24 08:30:00.0.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 08/10/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 08/10/2016

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4685505 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2017 05:55:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 2016-08-24 08:30:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/20/2017 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/27/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 03/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3387812 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016 12:01:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3387485 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2447238 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BAUER, RONALD ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927743 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751968.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MILIEFSKY, ALLEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509648 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 01:14:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.