This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 23:09:53

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 a Other - Arbitration case was filed by ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC against ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXX-CJC
  • Filing Date 08/23/2018
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Other - Arbitration
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC
  • Represented By
    • LAW OFFICES OF GARY A. BEMIS APC
  • Respondent ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant ULTIMATE FRANCHISES, INC.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC...

REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC...

Fees Apply
PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC O...

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC O...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER ...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER ...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRI...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRI...

Fees Apply
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ...

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ...

Fees Apply
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ...

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ...

Fees Apply
MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ...

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS,...

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS,...

Fees Apply
APPLICATION TO SERVE THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE AND O...

APPLICATION TO SERVE THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE AND O...

Fees Apply
APPLICATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/06/2019.

APPLICATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/06/2019.

Fees Apply
AMENDED PETITION (SECOND) FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIO...

AMENDED PETITION (SECOND) FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIO...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD 04/19/2019 09:30:00 AM.
  • 04/19/2019
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD CONTINUED TO 06/21/2019 AT 09:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.
  • 04/19/2019
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD SCHEDULED FOR 06/21/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 04/12/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC ON 04/12/2019
  • 04/12/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3780316 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2019 11:29:50 AM.
  • 04/05/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12527611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12351380.
  • 04/05/2019
  • REQUEST TO CONTINUE COURT HEARING FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC ON 04/05/2019
  • 04/05/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4955827 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2019 11:21:34 AM.
  • 03/08/2019
  • APPLICATION TO SERVE THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE AND ORDER THEREON
  • 03/14/2019
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD 03/08/2019 09:30:00 AM.
  • 03/14/2019
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD SCHEDULED FOR 04/19/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 03/05/2019
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12510596 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12334315.
  • 02/06/2019
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/06/2019.
  • 02/06/2019
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC ON 02/06/2019
  • 03/05/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3757198 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2019 07:01:16 PM.
  • 01/16/2019
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD 01/11/2019 09:00:00 AM.
  • 01/11/2019
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD CONTINUED TO 03/08/2019 AT 09:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.
  • 01/11/2019
  • PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD SCHEDULED FOR 03/08/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
  • 10/30/2018
  • AMENDED PETITION (SECOND) FILED BY ALL POINTS PUBLIC RELATIONS, LLC ON 10/30/2018
  • 10/30/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2727995 RECEIVED ON 10/30/2018 02:04:06 PM.

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.