This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/04/2018 at 17:31:39 (UTC).

ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION VS. OC INTERIOR SERVICES LLC, AS TRUSTEE FOR VIA CEREZA TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/02/2017 ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OC INTERIOR SERVICES LLC, AS TRUSTEE FOR VIA CEREZA TRUST. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASS

Defendant

OC INTERIOR SERVICES LLC, AS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ON 10/16/2017; Filing Party: ALISO VILLAS CONDOMIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/16/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ON 07/14/2017; Filing Party: ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ON 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LAW OFFICE OF PAMELA ABBOTT MOORE FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12167137 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11990838.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ON 06/02/2017; Filing Party: ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ON 06/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OC INTERIOR SERVICES, LLC AS TRUSTEE OF THE CANYON TRUST NO. 28022 DATED is a litigant

Latest cases where ALISO VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION is a litigant