This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/30/2018 at 00:39:27 (UTC).

ALICE UNDERWOOD VS. SPRING VALLEY POST ACUTE LLC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 ALICE UNDERWOOD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SPRING VALLEY POST ACUTE LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTINE SWALVE

ALICE UNDERWOOD

Defendants

MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC

SPRING VALLEY POST ACUTE LLC

VICTOR VALLEY HOSPITAL ACQUISITION, INC.

VICTOR VALLEY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER

BRENDA UNDERWOOD

BECKY UNDERWOOD

STANLEY UNDERWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORAN LAW

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BROBECK, WEST, BORGES, ROSA & DOUVILLE LLP

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION - OTHER (TO FILE UNDER SEAL) FILED BY SPRING VALLEY POST ACUTE LLC; MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON 02/15/2017

APPLICATION - OTHER (TO FILE UNDER SEAL) FILED BY SPRING VALLEY POST ACUTE LLC; MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON 02/15/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927163 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751388.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927163 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751388.

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) FILED BY MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON 10/21/2016

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) FILED BY MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON 10/21/2016

JURY INSTRUCTIONS (JOINT) FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE; SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 10/20/2017

JURY INSTRUCTIONS (JOINT) FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE; SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 10/20/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 11/20/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 11/20/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1427429 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1427429 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2515299 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2515299 REJECTED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 10/24/2016

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 10/24/2016

OPPOSITION FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 11/14/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 11/14/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/23/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/23/2017

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 02/05/2018

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 02/05/2018

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 3) FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/20/2017

MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 3) FILED BY VICTOR VALLEY GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER ON 10/20/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 11/21/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 11/21/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SPRING VALLEY POST ACUTE LLC; MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON 03/21/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY SPRING VALLEY POST ACUTE LLC; MERIDIAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC ON 03/21/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/29/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/29/2016

STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 02/08/2018

STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 02/08/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE; SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE; SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 02/26/2016

299 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 07/16/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • JURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 11/13/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/22/2018 08:28:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/14/2018 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1432840 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROCEDURAL STIPULATIONS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 02/21/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • JURY TRIAL CONTINUED TO 07/16/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
441 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 03/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3394166 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016 04:41:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1311153 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016 04:11:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER BANKS, ANDREW ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927163 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751388.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE; SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE; SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY UNDERWOOD, ALICE; SWALVE, CHRISTINE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446538 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 08:37:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.