This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/04/2022 at 06:42:27 (UTC).

ALESSANDRO PIROZZI VS. FISERV CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 ALESSANDRO PIROZZI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against FISERV CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alessandro Pirozzi

Chef Alessandro Pirozzi, Inc.

Pirozzi Enterprises, LLC

Defendants

Cardconnect

Fiserv Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Foroozandeh, APC.

Defendant Attorney

Polsinelli LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC. ON 11/22/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC. ON 11/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO ON 11/22/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO ON 11/22/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802892.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802892.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 11/24/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 11/24/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 12/06/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 12/06/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO ON 12/07/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO ON 12/07/2021

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY CARDCONNECT; FISERV CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY CARDCONNECT; FISERV CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/04/2022 08:59:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/04/2022 08:59:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/04/2022 08:59:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1933970 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2021 03:41:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY CARDCONNECT; FISERV CORPORATION ON 12/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO ON 12/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41272403 RECEIVED ON 12/07/2021 12:15:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 12/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41271996 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2021 03:34:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21092979 RECEIVED ON 11/24/2021 11:23:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/30/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC.; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC ON 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/28/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N06 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12974975 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12802892.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41267411 RECEIVED ON 11/22/2021 04:00:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 11/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO ON 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PIROZZI, ALESSANDRO; PIROZZI ENTERPRISES, LLC; CHEF ALESSANDRO PIROZZI, INC. ON 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARDCONNECT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fiserv, Inc. is a litigant