This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 07:05:04 (UTC).

ALEKSANDRA LESZCZYNSKI VS TOMAS LESZCZYNSKI

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 ALEKSANDRA LESZCZYNSKI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TOMAS LESZCZYNSKI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8709

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

Respondent

LESZCZYNSKI, TOMAS JAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/10/2018; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/10/2018; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 04/02/2018; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/02/2018; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/02/2018; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/02/2018 AMENDED PRELIM; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, TOMAS JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/02/2018 AMENDED PRELIM; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 04/02/2018; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/21/2018 PROOF OF SERVICE ON AMENDED PETITION AND AMENDED SUMMONS; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 01/18/2018 PRELIM; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 10/25/2017; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/25/2017; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 10/25/2017; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/25/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/25/2017; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 10/25/2017 Amended; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 10/25/2017; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PETITION - AMENDED 10/25/2017; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • SUMMONS - AMENDED PETITION 10/25/2017; Filing Party: LESZCZYNSKI, ALEKSANDRA

    Read MoreRead Less